U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • July 28, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 28, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 25, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order of Detention - DROPS]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 30, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • June 30, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2016: [Request for Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.