U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-40102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Behling
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Proposed Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • May 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • May 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.