U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boschee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 22, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.