U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Krejci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.