U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-40066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woldt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Certificate]
  • December 27, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • December 27, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • December 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.