U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-10045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schaller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 23, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 29, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 29, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 13, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 18, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.