U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rolla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 13, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 03, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • January 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • December 29, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Request for Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.