U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oxner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 12, 2017: [Restitution Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 06, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Request]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Certificate]
  • August 21, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • August 21, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.