U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:11-cr-40065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 11, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 14, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • May 14, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 14, 2018: [Request for Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.