U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cr-40136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.