U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.