U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 23, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • October 26, 2016: [Transport Defendant]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 03, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • September 01, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Request for Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.