U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:96-cr-40009-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hurbenca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Proposed Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer of Garnishee]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Certificate]
  • November 29, 2021: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • November 29, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 03, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.