U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-30193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 26, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.