U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 08, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.