U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horned Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 12, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 05, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.