U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-10056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DuBray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 15, 2019: [Furlough]
  • August 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 13, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Request for Summons]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 03, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.