U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-30010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. War Bonnett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 17, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 04, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.