U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Camphor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 17, 2016: [Response]
  • May 17, 2016: [Request]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.