U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouillard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Proposed Order]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • May 10, 2016: [Certificate]
  • May 09, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • May 09, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • May 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.