U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:00-cr-50081-4
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Washington et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 13, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2016: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.