U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cr-50119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mesteth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 19, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.