U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cr-50054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McMillan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Supplement]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 22, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.