U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-50069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 14, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Certificate]
  • January 16, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 10, 2018: [Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 21, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.