U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:08-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Croft et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.