U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Runner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 04, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2019: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Request for Summons]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.