U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:99-cr-40147-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Storm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Answer of Garnishee]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 09, 2020: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • April 09, 2020: [Certificate]
  • April 09, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • April 09, 2020: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.