U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-30108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • May 12, 2017: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.