U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Inman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 01, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 13, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.