U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sorensen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 09, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 05, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 08, 2017: [Transcript]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 25, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 25, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 04, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 03, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 03, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2017: [Leave to]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Brief]
  • April 13, 2017: [Text Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • April 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response]
  • April 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 06, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 12, 2016: [Departure]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Leave to]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 07, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • October 07, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • October 06, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 06, 2016: [Verdict]
  • October 06, 2016: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 06, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • October 06, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 06, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 06, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 05, 2016: [Jury List]
  • October 05, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 28, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 28, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 26, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 22, 2016: [In Limine]
  • September 22, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 21, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 21, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 16, 2016: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 23, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 22, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 13, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2016: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2016: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 02, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [Response]
  • May 25, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request]
  • May 24, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • May 24, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.