U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 30, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 09, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • February 08, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • February 07, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 16, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 30, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 02, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • July 05, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 24, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 24, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 20, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 26, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 15, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 03, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 26, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 26, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 13, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 10, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 10, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 10, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Response]
  • February 09, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 08, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 08, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response]
  • February 07, 2017: [Response]
  • February 07, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: [Joinder]
  • February 03, 2017: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 03, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • February 02, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 01, 2017: [In Limine]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Request]
  • January 03, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 01, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 01, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • October 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • October 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [Text Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • October 18, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 24, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 24, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.