U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roubideaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2016: [Waiver]
  • July 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 23, 2016: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2016: [Discovery]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.