U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 10, 2018: [Forfeiture]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2017: [Forfeiture]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2016: [Discovery]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.