U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 04, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 01, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 13, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 13, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 11, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 11, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 22, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response]
  • August 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 03, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 17, 2017: [Dismiss Count]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • March 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 26, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 12, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 12, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 11, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2016: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.