U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:00-cr-50060-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Fool Head et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Certificate]
  • August 07, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 30, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2018: [Request for Garnishment Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Certificate]
  • July 12, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 12, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.