U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuny et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer of Garnishee]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 13, 2022: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • September 13, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Proposed Order]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Answer of Garnishee]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Answer of Garnishee]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Certificate]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Certificate]
  • December 15, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • December 15, 2020: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • December 15, 2020: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Proposed Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • May 08, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • May 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Certificate]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Garnishment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.