U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-50016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ponce et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 11, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 23, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 03, 2021: [Response]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Supplement]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • January 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 29, 2021: [Admission]
  • January 26, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Response]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Request for Garnishment Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • September 11, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 19, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 17, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.