U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-50100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Calf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 10, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 27, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.