U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-50057-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. White Face
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.