U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-50047-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Water
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 07, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 03, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.