U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaRoche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2017: [Consent]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 22, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 22, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 17, 2016: [Furlough]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 31, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • May 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.