U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04158
  • Case Name: Vermillion Area Chamber of Commerce and Development Company v. Eagle Creek Software Services, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 15, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 20, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • January 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Quash]
  • January 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 30, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 27, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Compel]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2016: [Protective Order]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.