U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Looking Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 31, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Furlough]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Furlough]
  • August 21, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 15, 2016: [Waiver]
  • July 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Request]
  • May 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 16, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.