U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trevino et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 10, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 04, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 04, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 18, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • August 16, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 04, 2017: [Leave to]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 30, 2016: [Discovery]
  • September 27, 2016: [Response]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • September 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 25, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • August 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 11, 2016: [Request]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.