U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cr-50082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villarreal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss Amended Petition to Revoke]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Objection]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 31, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 31, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 30, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.