U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Makes Room For Them
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Request]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2018: [Request]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • August 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.