U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 28, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2016: [Request]
  • November 07, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Request]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.