U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order]
  • June 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 25, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.