U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 09, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 25, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 31, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Departure]
  • October 31, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 22, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2016: [Request]
  • July 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Request]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2016: [Arrest]
  • July 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.