U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Creek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 25, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 25, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 25, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 24, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • May 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 19, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 18, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.